Pollard v. Buckman et al

Plaintiff: Napoleon Pollard
Defendant: Joseph K Buckman and Roland Anderson
Case Number: 5:2008cv00289
Filed: October 23, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 149 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/11. (vjt)
May 25, 2011 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Everett Clarke Tucker, IV terminated; denying as moot 126 Motion to Stay; and directing the Clerk to change plaintiff's address to 3703 Hoyt Street, Chattanooga, TN 37411. Plaintiff should find his own lawyer immediately or proceed pro se in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/25/11. (kpr)
April 14, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 114 Motion for Bill of Costs and directing the Clerk of the Court to distribute to the named applicant, Thomas G. Williams, the amount of $2,250.00 from the Fund; granting 115 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas G. Williams terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/14/11. (kpr)
January 21, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Motion for Bill of Costs and directing the Clerk of the Court to distribute to Thomas G. Williams the amount of Twenty-Five Hundred Dollars ($2,500.00) from the Fund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/21/11. (bkp)
September 27, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting to the extent that the Court preapproves a maximum expenditure of $2,500.00 for review of plaintiff's medical records by an expert, and denying in all other respects 108 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/27/10. (bkp)
September 23, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part and modifying in part 105 Judge Kearney's proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; granting in part and denying in part 63 Buchman's motion for summary judgment; and granting 84 Norris and Byus's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/23/10. (hph)
November 19, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph K Buchman, within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)
November 3, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file an updated request to proceed ifp within ten days of the date of this Order and directing the Clerk to forward an in forma pauperis application to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/3/09. (bkp)
July 23, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing John C. Stratford to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings in this action and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/23/09. (bkp)
June 24, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 6/24/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollard v. Buckman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Napoleon Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph K Buckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?