Rials v. Monticello Health Care Center

Plaintiff: Penny Rials
Defendant: Monticello Health Care Center
Case Number: 5:2008cv00298
Filed: November 6, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Ashley
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING separate John Doe defts and dismissing case with prejudice upon the stipulation of the plaintiff. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/4/10. (bkp)
October 1, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to provide proof of service and identify the John Doe defts within 20 days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/10. (vjt)
September 21, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of dismissal as to separate defts Monticello Health Care Center, LLC, Perennial Healthcare Holdings, LLC, and Perennial Healthcare Management, LLC. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/21/10. (bkp)
September 20, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing the case with prejudice as the separate deft Unum Group, plaintiff and Unum Group to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/20/10. (bkp)
August 9, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule for 21 days and setting the ddl for filing a responsive brief on the administrative record until August 23, 2010. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/9/10. (bkp)
April 20, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward a copy of the Court's Order dated April 20, 2009 to Plaintiff and to add the Plaintiff's address to the docket. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rials v. Monticello Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Rials
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monticello Health Care Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?