Darrough v. Norris

Plaintiff: Kedrick Trevon Darrough, Sr
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00303
Filed: November 13, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying [] Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/18/2010. (mkf)
February 10, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 19 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Darrough's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2 and Amended Habeas Petition 17 are DISMISSED with prejudice; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/10/10. (vjt)
October 23, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the District Court dismiss with prejudice 2 Petitioner's writ of habeas corpus and 17 Petitioner's amended petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/23/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrough v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kedrick Trevon Darrough, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?