Blue v. Norris

Plaintiff: Marcus Blue
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00304
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/8/09. (bkp)
November 5, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/5/09. (bkp)
August 11, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Marcus Blue re 37 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp)
June 18, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that this 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied as untimely and this action should be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 7/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 6/18/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Represented By: Kelly K. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?