Peppers v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Adam Scott Peppers
Defendant: Larry Norris, Ronald Langhammer, Collins, Windy Kelly, J Johns, Patricia Kelly, Connie Hubbard and John Lytle
Case Number: 5:2008cv00314
Filed: November 28, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 96 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/13/10. (bkp)
September 24, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 80 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against Delois Collins, Janice Joyner and Patricia Kelly without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/24/09. (bkp)
June 25, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Dismiss Party; Adopting 62 Partial Report and Recommendation ; all claims against Defendant Lytle are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/25/09. (mkf)
April 1, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel for CMS to file under seal within ten days the last-known addresses of defts Kelly and Johns so that service of process can be effected upon them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/1/09. (bkp)
March 30, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 28 granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defts and dismissing pltf's claims against defts Norris, Kelley and Langhammer with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/30/09. (bkp)
March 12, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that the 20 ADC Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and that Plaintiff's claims against these Defendants be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 3/26/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 3/12/09. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peppers v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Scott Peppers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Langhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lytle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?