Holly v. Norris

Plaintiff: Rodney Holly
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2008cv00327
Filed: December 10, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying as moot 25 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/26/09. (dac)
June 1, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 12 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, judgment will be entered dismissing the petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/1/09. (vjt)
April 2, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the petition be dismissed with prejudice and the relief prayed for be denied 1 ; Objections to R&R due by 4/16/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/2/09. (tjj)
January 26, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER advising Petitioner of his opportunity to reply to 7 Respondent's Response to Habeas Petition, within thirty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/26/09. (mkf)
January 6, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rodney Holly and this Order on the respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail and directing respondent to file his responsivle pleadings within 20 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/6/09. (bkp)
December 12, 2008 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the petitioner to submit either the $5.00 statutory filing fee or an ifp application within 30 days of the entry date of this Order, and directing the Clerk to immediately forward to petitioner an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/12/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holly v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?