Day et al v. Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa

Case Number: 5:2008cv00332
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: O Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: O

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses the complaint and all claims in this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/12/11. (vjt)
April 12, 2011 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 First MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Allan Rands; H & S Partnership, by partner Shawn Spainhouer; H.D. & Carolyn Spainhouer, by partner, H.D. Spainhouer; L & S Partnership, by partner Larry Petty; Ken C. Holt Jr. Farm Partnershi p, by partner Kenneth Holt, Jr.; David Cox, doing business as David Cox Farms; Steve Stevens, doing business as S & D Farms; C.B. Stevens Farms, Inc.; Vonda Stevens Kirkpatrick, doing business as Rondo Farms; Jonathan Oldner, doing business as Jonathan Oldner Farms; and Kirk Hill. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/12/11. (kpr)
June 16, 2010 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached as to the plaintiff. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/16/10. (bkp)
June 15, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the three year statute of limitations applicable to causes of action for tort bars Pltfs' claims for bad faith; accordingly, Deft's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/15/10. (vjt)
June 9, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa as to Robertson Brothers Farms, Round Lake Planting Company, DE & K Farms Partnership, R & J Farms Partnership, by partner Ricky Downen and Leo Bottoms. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/9/10. (bkp)
May 26, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion in Limine as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/10. (bkp)
March 15, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion for Protective Order; granting 72 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery and allowing plaintiffs one hour in which to depose Steven Hawkins. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/15/10. (bkp)
March 5, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to Deem Admitted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/5/10. (bkp)
March 9, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa dismissing plaintiffs' complaint against Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa and directing the Clerk to terminate these plaintiffs. This case will remain open until the conclusion of the consolidated cases, and counsel should continue to file all pleadings in the lead case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/9/09. (bkp)
December 15, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Change Venue and directing the Clerk to transfer this case to the Pine Bluff Division of this Court. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/15/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day et al v. Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?