Rasmussen v. Norris

Plaintiff: Philip Rasmussen
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2009cv00008
Filed: January 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Philip Rasmussen re 15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing petition for habeas corpus with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/27/09. (bkp)
March 10, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed and the relief requested be denied, as ground one is without merit, and grounds two, three, and four are not properly before the Court and are procedurally barred; Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/10/09. (vjt)
January 26, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this order on the respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/26/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmussen v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?