Early v. Norris

Plaintiff: Reginald Early
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2009cv00009
Filed: January 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (copy mailed) Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/18/09. (mkf)
March 3, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting deft's 5 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/3/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 3/4/2009 to correct linkage references.) (thd)
February 11, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending the motion to dismiss be granted and the petition be dismissed without prejudice 5 . Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/11/09. (tjj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Early v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?