Brooks v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Rickey Brooks
Defendant: Marshall D Reed, Gaylin Lay, Larry Norris, Grant Harris and Comella Garrett
Case Number: 5:2009cv00017
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/6/09. (vjt)
March 17, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Pltf's Complaint 1 be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), and all pending motions be DENIED AS MOOT; Objections to R&R due by 3/31/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/17/09. (vjt)
January 26, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff an ifp application and calculation sheet; Pltf must submit, w/i 30 days of the entry of this Order, either (1) the $350 statutory filing fee; or (2) a proper and complete ifp application,with the required calculation sheet completed and signed by an authorized prison official; failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action w/o prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 1/26/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall D Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylin Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comella Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickey Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?