Ashford v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Charles Ashford
Defendant: Roger Johnson and Gillespie
Case Number: 5:2009cv00023
Filed: January 26, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants against Charles Ashford re 43 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/16/09. (bkp)
December 4, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that defts' motion to dismiss be granted, and pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute 35 . All pending motions be denied as moot 36 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 12/4/2009. (lej)
April 1, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct names of defts Roderick Johnson and Haltom Gillespie. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 4/1/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashford v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?