Woodard v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Jeffery Woodard
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2009cv00057
Filed: February 25, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees and directing the Social Security Administration to pay $4,810.25 from the past-due benefits owed to Plaintiff to Plaintiff's attorney, Alan J. Nussbaum; and directing Plaintiff's attorney to pay to Plaintiff the $3,401.74 that was previously awarded under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/29/10. (bkp)
April 20, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 21 Report and Recommendations and granting plaintiff's attorney an EAJA award of attorney's fees in the amount of $3,401.74 and directing the Commissioner to certify and pay to Alan J. Nussbaum that amount. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/20/10. (bkp)
November 25, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Jeffery Woodard against Social Security Administration re 13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and remanding case to the Commissioner. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/25/09. (bkp)
November 9, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the final decision of the Commissioner be reversed and this case be remanded for proceedings consistent with this opinion. Objections to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS due 11/23/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/9/2009. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Woodard
Represented By: Alan J. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?