Ward v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Terry Lee Ward
Defendant: Larry Norris and Does
Case Number: 5:2009cv00060
Filed: February 26, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 17 Order on Report and Recommendations; Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice, for failing to comply with the Court's March 2, 2009 Order and FRcvP 8; the Court certifies, pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3), that an ifp appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/7/09. (mkf)
April 22, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending this case be dismissed, without prejudice, due to Plaintiff's failure to properly comply with the 3 Court's 3/2/09; recommending all remaining motions be denied, as moot; and reco mmending the Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommended Disposition would not be taken in good faith. Order Objections to R&R due by 5/6/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/22/09. (hph)
March 2, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to forward to plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, along with a calculation sheet; directing plaintiff to file within 30 days of the entry of this Order either the $350 filing fee or a properly completed application to proceed ifp; and also to file within 30 days of this Order, an Amended Complaint containing the information specified in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/2/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?