Rodriguez v. Courtney

Plaintiff: Manuel Rodriguez
Defendant: Tammy Courtney
Case Number: 5:2009cv00063
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Tammy Courtney against Manuel Rodriguez re 43 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing this case with prejudice and certifying that an ifp appeal taken from the order and this judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/14/09. (bkp)
April 13, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rejecting 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and referring the case back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/13/09. (bkp)
March 27, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous 2 . This dismissal count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 USC 1915(g). The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 4/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/27/2009. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?