Tarkington v. Mullins et al

Plaintiff: Johnny Tarkington
Defendant: Tim Mullins, Neema Suphan, Alva M Green and Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 5:2009cv00069
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 128 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/26/10. (vjt)
March 10, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 114 Motion for Reconsideration re 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johnny Tarkington and directing the Clerk to re-docket as a memorandum in support of his claims and a motion for a jury trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/10/10. (bkp)
October 19, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 90 MOTION to Amend/Correct 2 Complaint 93 MOTION to Clarify filed by Johnny Tarkington: These motions are actually briefs in support of plaintiff's complaint and shall be re-docketed as such. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/19/09. (bkp)
October 2, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting deadline for filing of dispositive motions within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/2/09. (mkf)
May 20, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to re-issue summons on Tim Mullins, Vesta Mullins and Juanita Stell and issue summons on deft Neema Suplan and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/20/09. (bkp)
April 30, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 12 Motion to Compel; granting 13 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 26 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarkington v. Mullins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Tarkington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neema Suphan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alva M Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?