Manning v. Varner Unit

Case Number: 5:2009cv00081
Filed: March 11, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Darrell Manning re 10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing petition with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/13/09. (bkp)
June 24, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darrell Manning be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the relief prayed for be denied; Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 6/24/09. (vjt)
May 4, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing petitioner of his opportunity to reply within 30 days to respondent's argument that the petition should be dismissed, or any other issues raised in the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/4/09. (bkp)
March 30, 2009 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to indicate Larry Norris as respondent and to serve a copy of the Petition and this Order on the respondent and the Attorney General by regular mail. Signed by Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr. on 3/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Varner Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?