Richard v. Norris

Plaintiff: Louis E Richard
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2009cv00087
Filed: March 18, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/21/09. (dac)
August 11, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Louis E Richard re 17 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing petition with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp)
July 22, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Louis E Richard be denied as untimely and this action be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice; and that Petitioner's 11 MOTION for Jury Trial be denied; Objections to R&R due by 8/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/22/09. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis E Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?