Stiff v. Morehead

Plaintiff: Craig Stiff
Defendant: Robert F Morehead
Case Number: 5:2009cv00092
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2011 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Judge Kearney's recommended disposition with some added clarifications; granting 35 and 71 Defendants' motions to dismiss; denying 56 Plaintiff motion for summary judgment. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's federal c ivil rights claim with prejudice. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's supplemental state-law claims without prejudice. The Court thanks Stiff's appointed counsel for their diligent and able efforts. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/22/11. (hph)
August 3, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/3/10. (bkp)
May 20, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dermott, City of: Parties are directed to submit additional briefs within 20 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/20/10. (bkp)
June 8, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service on defendant Kenneth Phillips; the Clerk shall prepare summons for the defendant and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the original (DE#1) and amended complaints (DE#7) and summons on defendant w/o prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor; defendant Robert Morehead is hereby DISMISSED from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/8/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiff v. Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert F Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?