Terry v. Norris

Plaintiff: Macey Terry
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2009cv00101
Filed: April 1, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/8/10. (dac)
December 11, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Larry Norris against Macey Terry re 19 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing petition for writ of habeas corpus with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/11/09. (bkp)
November 19, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Petitioner's 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DISMISSED with prejudice, and the relief requested be DENIED. Objections to REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS due 11 days from the entry date of these recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/19/2009. (jas)
May 20, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing petitioner of his opportunity to reply within 30 days to 8 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Larry Norris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macey Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?