Rodriguez v. Norris

Plaintiff: Manuel Rodriguez
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2009cv00119
Filed: April 21, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/7/09. (dac)
July 22, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 26 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, the petition for writ of habeas corpus 2 is dismissed; all requested relief is denied; judgment will be entered for respondent Larry Norris. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/22/09. (vjt)
July 6, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the petition should be dismissed and all requested relief should be denied and judgment should be entered for Norris 2 . Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/6/2009. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?