Marshall v. Burden et al

Plaintiff: Calvin Lee Marshall
Defendant: Anthony Burden, N Martin, Joe Page, Wendy Kelly and Does
Case Number: 5:2009cv00128
Filed: May 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 83 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/20/10. (vjt)
July 28, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 71 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying for 60 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 27 Motion to Stay filed by Calvin Lee Marshall. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/28/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 29 and granting in part and denying in part defendants' 11 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous: Plaintiff may proceed with his claims of the use of excessive force against defts Burden & Page , and denial of medical treatment by the unknown Doe defts, and the remainder of pltf's claims are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/22/10. (bkp) Modified on 2/22/2010 to correct typographical error(bkp).
September 25, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 15 and 18 Plaintiff's Motions to Appoint Counsel; DENYING 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; and GRANTING 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/25/2009. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Burden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Lee Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Burden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?