Caldwell v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: John Caldwell
Defendant: Grant Harris and Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 5:2009cv00129
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2010 128 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 127 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/1/10. (bkp)
November 29, 2010 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 121 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, deft Harris's 97 Motion for Summary Judgment and 103 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment are GRANTED, and he is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action; Grant Harris terminated. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/29/10. (vjt)
November 12, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re docket entry # 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Correctional Medical Services. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order and Judgment adopting this Recommended Disposi tion would not be taken in good faith. An original and one copy of any objections must be received in the office of the U. S. District Clerk no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/12/10. (ksm)
April 5, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Therefore, the Court reaffirms 80 Order Adopting Partial Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/5/2010. (jct)
January 11, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 74 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying as moot 56 Motion for TRO filed by John Caldwell. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/11/10. (bkp)
September 14, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss; Adopting Partial Report and Recommendation 26 and directing deft Harris to file an answer within ten days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/14/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?