Goal v. Retzer Resources Inc et al

Plaintiff: Steven Goal
Defendant: Retzer Resources Inc, Retzer Group Inc, Mike Retzer and McDonald's Restaurant of Helena No. 5425
Case Number: 5:2009cv00137
Filed: May 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 72 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts on all claims, dismissing the complaint of Steven Goal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/16/10. (vjt)
November 10, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion in Limine re Stray Remarks; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion in Limine re Undisclosed Witnesses; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion in Limine re any Mental Disorder. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/10/10. (vjt)
November 3, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/3/10. (bkp)
May 28, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Attorney Fees and ordering plaintiff to reimburse defts for the court reporter expenses in the amount of $186.85 and directing Goal to travel to Jackson, Mississippi, to be deposed there. IF GOAL FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, ADDTL SANCTIONS MAY RESULT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/28/10. (bkp)
December 22, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment. The motion to dismiss or for partial summary judgment on Goal's Title VII claims for race discr imination & retaliation is GRANTED, & those claims are dismissed without prejudice. Without objection, the motion to dismiss or for partial summary judgment on the FMLA & sex discrimination claims is GRANTED. The motion to dismiss the Retzer Group Inc is GRANTED. The motion to dismiss or for partial summary judgment on the FLSA claims, as well as the Section 1981 & ACRA race discrimination claims, is DENIED. The complaint made no Title VII or ADA claims against Mike Retzer individually, but the motion to dismiss or for partial summary judgment on the ACRA retaliation claim against him is DENIED.Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/22/09. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goal v. Retzer Resources Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Goal
Represented By: Lucien Ramseur Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retzer Resources Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retzer Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Retzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Restaurant of Helena No. 5425
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?