Russell v. Harris et al

Plaintiff: Isaac Russell
Defendant: Johnnie Harris, Mark Cashion, Marvin Evans and John Lowe
Case Number: 5:2009cv00139
Filed: May 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, the 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED with prejudice; the requested relief is denied and any pending motions are denied as moot; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/6/10. (vjt)
December 21, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Petitioner's 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be DISMISSED with prejudice and the relief requested DENIED; directing the Clerk of the Court to send the Petitioner a 1983 Complaint form packet in the event he wishes to bring a 1983 action; objections due 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/21/2009. (jas)
June 23, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing petitioner of his opportunity to reply within thirty days to respondent's argument that his petition should be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 6/23/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?