Jones v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Charles Freyder, Yolanda Clark, Darryl Golden and Sherry Conrad
Case Number: 5:2009cv00157
Filed: June 2, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 125 Jury Verdict, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Charles Freyder and Ray Hobbs dismissing the complaint of Larry Wayne Jones with prejudice; the requested relief is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/28/12. (vjt)
August 24, 2012 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/24/12. (kpr)
April 5, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Hobbs and Freyder's objections to 107 Partial Report and Recommendations are OVERRULED; the defts' 95 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; summary judgment is granted on pltf's claims for monetary damages asserted against the defts in their official capacities; these claims are dismissed with prejudice; summary judgment is denied in all other respects. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/5/12. (vjt)
March 9, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 108 MOTION to Extend Time to File Objections filed by Charles Freyder and Ray Hobbs; Objections to R&R due 3/20/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/9/12. (vjt)
May 19, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Phillip M. Brick, Jr. to represent pltf in all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/19/11. (vjt)
October 1, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 73 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, defts' 40 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART; pltf's 71 MOTION to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT; the individual capacity clai ms against defts Hobbs and Freyder for violation of Jones's First Amendment rights for the deprivation of his religious diet for approximately 16 months shall proceed and all other claims and defts are DISMISSED; Grant Harris, Sherry Conrad and Darryl Golden terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/1/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Freyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?