Brewer v. Syed et al

Plaintiff: Acie Brewer
Defendant: Shah Syed, Jerome Adams, Barron, Mary Moore, Neema Suphan, Tim Mullins, Jane Does and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 5:2009cv00162
Filed: June 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 76 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting 62 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Tim Mullins, Mary Moore. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/26/10. (bkp)
December 15, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 59 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing defendants Syed, Suphan and Barron without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/09. (bkp)
November 19, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Acie Brewer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)
October 13, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING Partial Report and Recommendations 42 and denying 3 Motion for TRO filed by Acie Brewer. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/13/09. (bkp)
August 11, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts Mullins, Suphan, Barron and Syed summons and complaint without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp)
July 24, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for deft Shah Syed and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on deft at the address provided under seal without prepayment of costs therefor; and that the Marshal send plaintiff's copy of process to the Clerk to remove the address prior to forwarding a copy to plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/24/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Syed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acie Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shah Syed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neema Suphan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?