Stokes v. Southern States Cooperative Inc

Plaintiff: George M Stokes
Defendant: Southern States Cooperative Inc
Case Number: 5:2009cv00170
Filed: June 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pursuant to a confidentiality agreement which was made part of the settlement agreement, the transcript of this proceeding, will remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/09/2012. (kcs)
March 8, 2012 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's oral request for an Order Re: General Order No. 54. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/08/2012. (kcs)
October 15, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 72 Order dismissing all claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/15/10. (bkp)
October 6, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 14 Motion in Limine re Dan Wojcik's testimony. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/6/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. Southern States Cooperative Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George M Stokes
Represented By: Charles S. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern States Cooperative Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?