Briley v. Ford et al

Plaintiff: Eddie Briley
Defendant: C Ford, E Adams and Baker
Case Number: 5:2009cv00174
Filed: June 17, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Motion of Joseph F. Kolb to Withdraw as appointed counsel for pltf; appointing John W. Fink to represent pltf in all further proceedings in this action; added Attorney John W. Fink for Eddie Briley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/11. (vjt)
April 1, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 MOTION of Stephen L. Curry to withdraw as appointed counsel for pltf; appointing Charles W. Reynolds to represent Eddie Briley in all further proceedings in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/1/11. (vjt)
January 20, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing William Thomas Baxter to represent plaintiff Eddie Briley and directing the Clerk to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/20/11. (bkp)
December 8, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 53 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by E Adams, Baker, C Ford. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/8/10. (bkp)
November 15, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the Evidentiary Hearing currently set for November 22, 2010 and cancelling the November 5, 2010 Witness Order, and directing the Clerk of the Court to correct the docket sheet to reflect a jury demand by the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/15/10. (bkp)
September 23, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to file a response to defts' 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/23/10. (bkp)
July 8, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the pro se plaintiff to notify the Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution with this action within 30 days of the date of this Order, as the 21 Scheduling Order dated June 17, 2010 was returned to sender. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/8/10. (bkp)
July 23, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts C. Ford, E. Adams and Sgt. Baker and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, along with the original and amended complaints, without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/23/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briley v. Ford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Briley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?