Shell Trademark Management BV et al v. Flabama Petro Inc

Plaintiff: Shell Trademark Management BV and Motiva Enterprises LLC
Defendant: Flabama Petro Inc
Case Number: 5:2009cv00192
Filed: July 6, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER 66 to reflect that the dismissal of claims against deft M.R. Petroleum, LLC are without prejudice, as previously stated in the Court's Order of May 26, 2011 68 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/15/11. (kpr)
June 1, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/1/11. (kpr)
May 26, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER based upon the 64 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Shell Trademark Management BV, Motiva Enterprises LLC, M R Petroleum LLC dismissing all claims against deft M.R. Petroleum, LLC, with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/26/11. (kpr)
March 21, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf Shell Trademark Management and deft M.R. Petroleum, LLC, to file a status report in this case on or before April 1, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/21/11. (kpr)
November 5, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 MOTION for Contempt filed by Shell Trademark Management BV, Motiva Enterprises LLC: Motion is granted and Plaintiffs are authorized to remove their trademarks and trade dress from store locations at 601 North Hutchinson in Pine Bluff, A rkansas and U.S. Highway 65 in Humnoke, Arkansas, thereafter the Plaintiffs may submit evidence of their costs and expenses, and the Court will award judgment in an appropriate amount against Gamma Mart Corporation and Iota Mart Corporation. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/5/10. (bkp)
August 11, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to set aside 39 Order to Show Cause directed to Donald Jenkins entered August 9, 2010. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/11/10. (vjt)
April 22, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 MOTION for Hearing Motion for Default and Hearing filed by Shell Trademark Management BV awarding the plaintiffs $259,200.00 as actual damages against Flabama and trebling thaat amount for a total damage against Flabama of & #036;777,600.00, plus attorney's fees and costs of $18,657.13; awarding plaintiffs $68,400.00 as actual damages against K & K, plus attorney's f ees and costs of $1,061.90, with interest to accrue on the amounts awarded herein at the maximum rate allowed by law; plaintiffs' action will continue as against separate defendant M.R. Petroleum, LLC, and a scheduling order will be entered as to it. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/22/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shell Trademark Management BV et al v. Flabama Petro Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Trademark Management BV
Represented By: John Polk Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Represented By: John Polk Talbot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flabama Petro Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?