Weary et al v. Strong Manufacturing Company Inc et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Weary and Robin Weary
Defendant: Strong Manufacturing Company Inc and John Does
Case Number: 5:2009cv00225
Filed: August 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/29/11. (kpr)
March 28, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing the individuals named in this Order to bring certain electronics into the George Howard, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse in Pine Bluff between Monday, April 4, 2011, and Friday, April 8, 2011. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/28/11. (kpr)
October 26, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/26/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weary et al v. Strong Manufacturing Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Weary
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Weary
Represented By: Morgan E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong Manufacturing Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?