Livingston v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: Marvin Livingston
Defendant: Ed Adams, Hunter, Johnson and Dolphin
Case Number: 5:2009cv00227
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 66 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/11. (kpr)
March 24, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to ensure the attendance of Nurse Randall, Deputy Pratt, and Deputy E. Murry at the April 7, 2011 Evidentiary Hearing; and directing the ADC to transport inmate Steven Haltiwanger, ADC #113274, and pltf. Marvin Livingston, ADC # 127661, together with his institutional and medical files to the April 7, 2011 hearing. The Clerk is directed to issue a subpoena directing the appearance of witness Moses Goins, 4309 West 16th Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the subpoena without pre-payment of fees and costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/24/11. (kpr)
August 31, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Compel; denying 48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/31/10. (bkp)
June 29, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 32 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/29/10. (vjt)
May 24, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johnson, Hunter, Ed Adams, Dolphin directing plaintiff to file a response within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/24/10. (bkp) Modified on 5/25/2010 to correct typographical error (bkp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Livingston v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?