Gibson v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Casiprin Gibson
Defendant: Steren Williams, Marvin Evans and Steven Jones
Case Number: 5:2009cv00283
Filed: September 10, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/26/12. (vjt)
March 26, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to mail to the Clerk's Office any pleadings or written discovery directed to Defendant Steven Jones. The docket sheet will reflect deft's service address as the "Clerk's Office," and the Clerk's Office will forward to him all pleadings Plaintiff files in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 3/26/12. (kpr) Modified on 3/26/2012 to correct typographical error (kpr).
December 21, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting aside 76 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Steven Jones and 74 Order on Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to deft Steven Jones having filed his Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/21/11. (kpr)
October 4, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion for Default Judgment against deft Steven Jones. The Clerk is directed to enter the party's default and to forward a copy of this Order to deft Jones, ADC, Pine Bluff Unit, 890 Free Line Drive, Pine Bluff, AR 71603-1498. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/4/11. (kpr)
September 13, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Robert Pierce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/13/11. (kpr)
June 28, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 MOTION by the Arkansas Attorney General to Withdraw as counsel of record for Steven Jones; the Attorney General is directed to make certain that deft Jones receives a copy of this Order; Steven Jones shall, within 20 days from the entry of this Order, provide the name and address of his new attorney as directed. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/11. (vjt)
February 24, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing William Griffin III to represent plaintiff Casiprin Gibson in all further proceedings; and the Clerk is directed to send counsel and plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/24/11. (kpr)
February 2, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 38 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney in their entirety. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants Marvin Evans and Steven Williams are dismissed. Sufficient evidence exists to prese nt the allegations against Defendant Jones to a jury. Counsel will be appointed for Plaintiff by separate Order. A trial date will be set by separate Order following the appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/2011. (jct)
January 4, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Arkansas Dept of Correction to ensure plaintiff's attendance at the Pre-Jury Hearing scheduled for January 12, 2011, together with a copy of Plaintiff's medical records and institutional file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/4/11. (bkp) Modified on 1/4/2011 to correct typographical error (bkp).
December 14, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a response to the 29 MOTION for Order filed by Casiprin Gibson within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/14/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casiprin Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steren Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?