Ashford v. Washington et al

Plaintiff: Charles Ashford
Defendant: Walter Washington and R Johnson
Case Number: 5:2009cv00291
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 47 Order granting plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/30/10. (bkp)
March 31, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 26 Motion for Order to grant his motion to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/31/10. (vjt)
March 30, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 Response filed by Charles Ashford and advising plaintiff that no witnesses will be allowed other than the plaintiff at the evidentiary hearing scheduled for April 12, 2010; and directing the Arkansas Department of Correction to ensure plaintiff's attendance at the hearing, and to bring plaintiff's institutional and medical records to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/30/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashford v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?