Perry v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Michael Ray Perry
Defendant: V Miller and Correctional Medical Services
Case Number: 5:2009cv00309
Filed: October 7, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of F Dean, V Miller against Michael Ray Perry re 24 Order dismissing complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/10. (bkp)
December 2, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff Barbara Saint John and defendant Correctional Medical Services, Inc. from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/09. (bkp)
November 18, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to notify this Court of his current address and his intent to continue prosecution with this action, pro se, within thirty days of the date of this Order; failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal w/o prejudice of pltf's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/18/09. (mkf)
November 4, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons on defts Nurse V. Miller and Nurse F. Dean and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on the defts in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?