Crift v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence Crift, Jr
Defendant: Jason Williams, Joey Moore, Jane Doe, McGehee-Desha County Hospital and Oboma Asemota
Case Number: 5:2009cv00326
Filed: October 26, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Desha
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 166 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. The plaintiff's attorney is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $75,000.00 and costs in the amount of $350.00. All deposition costs are disallowed as incidental to n ormal preparation for trial. Plaintiff's requests for copying, long distance, courier services, fax costs, expert expenses, postage, travel-related expenses and out-of-pocket expenses will also be disallowed as incidential to normal preparation for trial. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/31/11. (kpr)
March 15, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, re 161 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment, in favor of Lawrence Crift, Jr against Jason Williams, Joey Moore, individually, and in their official capacities, as McGehee City Police Officers; and from Wade Cantrell, in his individ ual and official capacity as a Desha County Deputy Sheriff, the amount of $75,000.00, together with interest from this date until the date paid at the rate of.25% per annum; attorneys fees and costs will be determined by separate agreement of the parties or by the Court, and plaintiff shall have up to and including April 10, 2011 to file his petition; all claims and causes of action against these defts are dismissed, all pending motiolns are moot; and the Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/15/11. (kpr)
March 3, 2011 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing defts McGehee-Desha Hospital, Ashley Barnes, Miranda Taylor and John Heard with prejudice pursuant to a settlement by the parties; and finding plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment and defts' second motion for summary judgment moot 138 100 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/3/11. (kpr)
February 15, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing all claims against deft Oboma Asemota with prejudice and finding as moot 68 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 104 Motion for Summary Judgment, and 147 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/15/11. (bkp)
October 13, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/13/10. (bkp)
October 1, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/10. (bkp)
July 16, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to Stipulation and Agreement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/16/10. (bkp)
January 5, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend is granted; Plaintiff may file his amended complaint within five (5) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/5/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crift v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Crift, Jr
Represented By: B. Dale West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGehee-Desha County Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oboma Asemota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?