Webb v. Clark et al

Plaintiff: Brian J Webb
Defendant: Richard L Clark and Parker
Case Number: 5:2009cv00332
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Baker, Farver, Parker and Richard L Clark against Brian J Webb; Consistent with the 61 Order, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/22/2010. (dmn)
November 26, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Defendants are entitled to qualified immunity and the Court recommends that all claims against them be dismissed as a matter of law, without further hearing; objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/26/2010. (jas)
September 13, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 53 Partial Report and Recommendations granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Baker, Richard L Clark, Farver, Parker; dismissing plaintiff's claims against defts Farver and Baker without prejudice; and dismissing the official capacity claims against defts Clark and Parker with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/13/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?