Davis v. Desha County Arkansas Circuit Court et al

Plaintiff: Willie Gaster Davis, Jr
Defendant: Leslie Steen and Skippy Leek
Case Number: 5:2009cv00338
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Skippy Leek against Willie Gaster Davis, Jr re 94 Order dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/3/11. (kpr)
December 2, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion for Reconsideration re 79 Judgment, 78 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and directing the Clerk to mail copies of the report and recommendations to plaintiff at his current address. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/2/10. (bkp)
November 19, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 78 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, dismissing case with prejudice, and certifying that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/19/10. (bkp)
October 28, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re docket entry # 61 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Skippy Leek. An in forma pauperis appeal from any Order and Judgment adopting this Recommended Disposition would not be taken in good faith. An original and one copy of your objections must be received in the office of the U. S. District Court no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/28/10. (ksm)
May 6, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 51 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 48 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Deft Leslie Steen is GRANTED, and Steen is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/6/10. (vjt)
February 16, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 28 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying plaintiff's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment and certifying that an ifp appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/16/10. (bkp)
December 9, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Reconsideration of the 5 Order, 6 and Judgment and vacating the Order and Judgment; dismissing defts Desha County Circuit Court and Arkansas Supreme Court with prejudice; directing the Clerk to amend the docket shee t to add as defts Leslie Steen and Skippy Leek; and directing the Clerk to prepare summons for these defts and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint and this order on them without prepayment of fees therefor; and referring case to Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray for all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/9/09. (bkp)
November 19, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 5 Order of Dismissal; the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice, for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; the dismissal constitutes a "strike" as defined by 28 USC 1915(g); the Court certifies, pursuant t o 28 USC 1915(a)(3), that an ifp appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order of Dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)(VACATED BY ORDER DATED 12/9/09.) Modified on 12/9/2009 (bkp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Desha County Arkansas Circuit Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Gaster Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Steen
Represented By: Shawn J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skippy Leek
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?