Goodrum v. Robinson et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Wayne Goodrum, Sr
Defendant: Gerald Robinson, Ronnie Cole, Ed Adams and Christie Ford
Case Number: 5:2009cv00343
Filed: November 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 70 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/19/11. (kpr)
February 15, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 42 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/15/11. (bkp)
October 21, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit a status report, including his current address, and a current request to proceed ifp to the Court within 30 days of this Order; and directing the Clerk of Court to send to plaintiff an application to proceed ifp, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/21/10. (bkp)
January 20, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims regarding the loss of his dentures and the conditions of his confinement without prejudice; and dismissing defts Gerald Robinson and Ronnie Cole as party defendants. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/20/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodrum v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wayne Goodrum, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?