Gaye v. Norris

Plaintiff: Darwin Gaye
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2009cv00351
Filed: November 10, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/7/10. (dac)
March 8, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 17 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Gaye's 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and 16 Motion for Appointment of Counsel are DENIED; all requested relief is DENIED, and judgment will be entered for Respondent. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/8/10. (vjt)
February 5, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Gaye's petition be denied 2 . All requested relief should be denied, and judgment should be entered for Norris. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/5/2010. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaye v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Gaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?