Nelson v. Glover et al

Plaintiff: Hilliard Nelson
Defendant: Don Glover, Thomas Deen and Skippy Leek
Case Number: 5:2009cv00396
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 45 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/16/11. (vjt)
December 21, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 35 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Skippy Leek dismissing the complaint of Hilliard Nelson with prejudice; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/21/10. (vjt)
December 2, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re docket entry # 21 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hilliard Nelson and docket entry # 22 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Skippy Leek. The Court certifies t hat an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order and Judgment adopting this Recommended Disposition would not taken in good faith. An original and one copy of your objections must be received in the office of the U. S. District Clerk no later than fourteen days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/02/2010. (ksm)
April 20, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 16 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 14 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, which has been construed as a Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/20/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Glover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilliard Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Glover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Deen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skippy Leek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?