Miller/Perry v. Norris

Plaintiff: Frances Renee Miller/Perry
Defendant: Larry Norris
Case Number: 5:2010cv00019
Filed: January 25, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 90 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/18/10. (bkp)
October 12, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 78 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Frances Renee Miller/Perry. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/12/10. (bkp)
August 16, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 59 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing, without prejudice, plaintiff's claims against all defts other than Dexter Payne and the names of all individuals, except Dexter Payne, are removed as party defts. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/16/10. (bkp)
July 13, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 41 Motion for Depositions by Written Questions; granting defts' 45 Motion to Stay Discovery, except that defts are directed to provide pltf with any discovery related to exhaustion of grievances regarding the issue s in this case; granting pltf's 47 Motion to Amend proposed witness list; granting pltf's 51 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to defts' 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment; pltf's response is due no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/13/10. (vjt)
July 6, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 26 Motion for Order filed by Frances Renee Miller/Perry and 28 Motion for Hearing filed by Frances Renee Miller/Perry. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/6/10. (bkp)
May 10, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and allowing plaintiff to proceed solely on her claim of cruel and unusual punishment by defts Larry Norris, Dexter Payne, John Maples, and James Gibson, and dismissing the remainder of plaintiff's claims without prejudice and removing the names of all other individuals named as party defts. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/10/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller/Perry v. Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Renee Miller/Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?