Lybrand v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Freddie Michael Lybrand
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 5:2010cv00045
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement reached by the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/1/12. (kpr)
April 27, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part, denying in part and holding in abeyance in part 64 Motion in Limine and granting in part, denying in part and holding in abeyance in part plaintiff's motion in limine 66 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/27/12. (kpr)
April 25, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 57 58 59 Objections by the parties to deposition designations and counter-designations. Objections are overruled, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/25/12. (kpr)(Docket entry modified on 4/25/2012 to correct the linkage.) (thd).
April 23, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Strike deft's expert, Eric Gehringer, from testifying at trial; and finding as moot 68 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/23/12. (kpr)
July 28, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 21 Motion to Strike without prejudice to re-file following the completion of discovery. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 7/28/11. (kpr)
March 28, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's emergency motion for relief 23 ; finding as moot 17 19 Motion to Strike. This case will be removed from the trial docket for the week of June 6, 2011. Plaintiff's response to the pending motion for summary judgment 14 will be due ten days following the completion of the discovery, as set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/28/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lybrand v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Michael Lybrand
Represented By: Nelson Gregory Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?