Jones v. Hunter et al

Plaintiff: James Lee Jones
Defendant: Cynthia Hunter, Samuel Baker and Cristie Scott-Ford
Case Number: 5:2010cv00051
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the ADC to ensure the attendance of inmates Robert Phillips (Diagnostic Unit) and Terrance Potter (Delta Regional Unit), for a Court Trial on December 6, 2010, at 11:00 a.m. in Little Rock. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/29/10. (vjt)
July 26, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration of 23 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel and 42 Order on Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/26/10. (bkp)
July 6, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a response to pltf's 44 MOTION for Reconsideration no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/6/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hunter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lee Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristie Scott-Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?