Harper v. Jefferson Hospital Association et al

Plaintiff: Glenda Harper
Defendant: Jefferson Hospital Association and Charles Marby
Case Number: 5:2010cv00052
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 50 Order entered on this day, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/17/2011. (dmn)
June 1, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/1/11. (kpr)
April 25, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT CONFIDENTIALITY AND QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/25/11. (kpr)
November 3, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/3/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Jefferson Hospital Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Harper
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Hospital Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Marby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?