Jones v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Jack Harold Jones
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Intervenor_plaintiff: Don W Davis
Case Number: 5:2010cv00065
Filed: March 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion to Vacate 54 Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/26/10. (bkp)
April 5, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Intervene of Jason Harold McGehee; granting 47 Motion to Intervene of Bruce Ward ; granting 9 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. To permit an appeal of this Order, Davis and Johnsons requests for stays of execution are GRANTED pending further orders from this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/5/10. (dac)
March 17, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion of Don W Davis to Intervene. Davis is directed to file a complaint on or before March 19, 2010. Responses to 9 Motion to Dismiss must be filed on or before 3/26/10 and the reply no later than 4/2/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/17/10. (dac)
March 11, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Jones's 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED; STAYING THE EXECUTION of Jack Harold Jones, Jr. pending further Orders from this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Harold Jones
Represented By: Dale E. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Represented By: C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Don W Davis
Represented By: Deborah Ruth Sallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?