Franklin v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Frank Lee Franklin
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00066
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 17 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action with prejudice; a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/31/11. (vjt)
April 26, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying Petitioner of his opportunity to file a reply to 11 Answer to Complaint filed by Ray Hobbs, on or before 5/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/26/10. (vjt)
April 19, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Respondent's 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Ray Hobbs answer due 4/26/2010 Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/19/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Lee Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?