Allen v. Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Doris Jones Allen
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2010cv00071
Filed: March 16, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Plaintiff Doris Jones Allen's appeal is denied and judgment is entered in favor of Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner, Social Security Administration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/15/11. (hph)
December 15, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 23 Fifth Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 1/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 12/15/10. (vjt)
November 15, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 12/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 11/15/10. (vjt)
October 13, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING pltf's 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 11/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/13/10. (vjt)
September 14, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 10/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 9/14/10. (vjt)
July 13, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief; Plaintiff Brief due by 8/13/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/13/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Jones Allen
Represented By: Mark B. Chadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?