Fitzgerald v. Owens et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Jerome Fitzgerald
Defendant: Clemetene Owens and Gaylon Lay
Case Number: 5:2010cv00080
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 49 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against deft Jones are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Tony Jones terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/7/10. (vjt)
July 22, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/22/10. (bkp)
July 8, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to provide, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, an address at which deft Tony Jones may be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/8/10. (vjt)
May 24, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for deft Tony Jones and the U.S. Marshal shall serve summons, complaints 2 9 10 , and this Order on deft Jones, at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/24/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzgerald v. Owens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jerome Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemetene Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaylon Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?