Cody v. Hobbs

Plaintiff: Steven D Cody
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 5:2010cv00089
Filed: March 30, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/13/10. (dac)
June 29, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER dismissing the petition with prejudice. All requested relief is denied. Judgment will be entered for Hobbs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 6/29/2010. (lej)
March 31, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Petitioner to submit either the $5.00 filing fee, or a properly completed ifp application (enclosed), no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/31/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cody v. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D Cody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?