Smith v. C B King Memorial School Inc et al

Plaintiff: Shirley Smith
Defendant: C B King Memorial School Inc, Gene Gregory, Katie Daniel, Molly Bratton, Theodore Brown, Ned McAffrey, Ricky Lattimore and Rita Kolb
Case Number: 5:2010cv00105
Filed: April 15, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Pine Bluff Office
County: Desha
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Shirley Smith, Sandra Young Harris, Gene Gregory, Alfonso Dixon, and Michael S. Moore to bring electronic devices into the courthouse on 9/15/11, subject to the provisions stated in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/14/11. (vjt)
September 13, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Shirley Smith, Sandra Young Harris, and Michael S. Moore to bring electronic devices into the courthouse on 9/15/11, subject to the provisions stated in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/13/11. (vjt)
February 17, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Compel to interrogs and requests for production, as set forth in this Order on or before March 21, 2011; and granting pltf $750 in attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/17/11. (bkp)
August 2, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/2/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. C B King Memorial School Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Smith
Represented By: Sandra Young Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C B King Memorial School Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ned McAffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Lattimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?